Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos José Ñáñez

Archbishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1946 BornCórdoba
17 Jul 197124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
12 Dec 199044.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
12 Dec 199044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
24 Jan 199144.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
20 Dec 199549.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
2 Feb 199649.5InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Nov 199852.3AppointedArchbishop of Córdoba, Argentina
12 Mar 199952.6InstalledArchbishop of Córdoba, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos José Ñáñez:
Archbishop Carlos José Ñáñez (born ) Archbishop of Córdoba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,439
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 7 Jan 2014