Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zenón Arámburu Urquiola, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wuhu [Wuhu]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1879BornVillarreal de Urrechu, Spain
189717.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
30 Jul 191233.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Jul 193656.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu], China
7 Jul 193656.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eressus
11 Oct 193657.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eressus
11 Apr 194666.7AppointedBishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China
4 Apr 196989.7DiedBishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China

MicroData Summary for Zenón Arámburu Urquiola:
Bishop Zenón Arámburu Urquiola S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Wuhu [Wuhu]

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015