Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benvenuto Diego Alonso y Nistal, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1871Born
8 Jun 189524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Dec 192352.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
23 Dec 192352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
1 May 192452.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
24 Mar 193866.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
23 May 193866.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Benvenuto Diego Alonso y Nistal
Bishop Benvenuto Diego Alonso y Nistal O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarucedo, Spain

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast