Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Granadillo

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1878Born
22 Jun 192345.2AppointedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
21 Oct 192345.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
13 Jan 192748.8DiedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Granadillo
Bishop Francisco Antonio Granadillo (born , died ) Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalbán

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast