Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alberto Llaguno Farias, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México

Titular Bishop of Mozotcori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1925Born
27 Oct 195631.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Feb 197549.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
28 Feb 197549.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
13 Apr 197549.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
26 Feb 199266.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for José Alberto Llaguno Farias
Bishop José Alberto Llaguno Farias S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tarahumara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast