Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Goizueta Gridilla, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Madera, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1912Born
28 Jul 193522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
14 Jan 197057.1AppointedPrelate of Madera, Chihuahua, México
14 Jan 197057.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Egara
8 Feb 197057.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egara
15 Feb 197865.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Egara
2 Feb 198875.1RetiredPrelate of Madera, Chihuahua, México
20 Jun 199178.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Madera, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Justo Goizueta Gridilla
Bishop Justo Goizueta Gridilla O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Madera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Unx, Spain

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast