Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Vélez Martínez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toluca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1904BornAtlacomulco
29 Jun 193429.8Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
8 Feb 195146.4AppointedBishop of Toluca, México, México
11 Apr 195146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Toluca, México, México
21 Sep 197975.0RetiredBishop of Toluca, México, México
22 Aug 198984.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Toluca, México, México

MicroData Summary for Arturo Vélez Martínez:
Bishop Arturo Vélez Martínez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toluca

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013