Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Guillermo López Soto

Bishop of Cuauhtémoc-Madera, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1947 Born
18 Aug 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chihuahua, México
17 Nov 199548.7AppointedBishop of Cuauhtémoc-Madera, Chihuahua, México
15 Dec 199548.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cuauhtémoc-Madera, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Guillermo López Soto
Bishop Juan Guillermo López Soto (born ) Bishop of Cuauhtémoc-Madera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Bárbara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuauhtémoc-Madera.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast