Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Xavier Ertl, S.A.C.

Bishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1966 Born
25 May 199629.7Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
29 Dec 199630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
27 Apr 201649.6AppointedBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
23 Jul 201649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil
24 Jul 201649.8InstalledBishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edgar Xavier Ertl
Bishop Edgar Xavier Ertl S.A.C. (born ) Bishop of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Prata do Iguaçu
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Glória, Co-Cathedral, Francisco Beltrão, Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmas-Francisco Beltrão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2016
  • c1: CB, 27 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018