Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Battisti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Udine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1925Born
5 Apr 194722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Padova {Padua}, Italy
20 Sep 194722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
13 Dec 197247.9AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
25 Feb 197348.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
28 Oct 200075.7RetiredArchbishop of Udine, Italy
1 Jan 201286.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Battisti (VIAF: 62931198)
Archbishop Alfredo Battisti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasi, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained DeaconPadua Seminary, Chapel, Padua, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained PriestChurch, Creola di Mestrino, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine
Death PlaceUdine, Archdiocese of Udine
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Crypt, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 Jan 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 4 Feb 2018