Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Melgoza Osorio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1912BornCoalcomán
7 Dec 193826.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 197058.2AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
29 Jun 197058.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
5 Feb 197966.9AppointedBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
15 Mar 198977.0RetiredBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México
4 Sep 200795.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México

MicroData Summary for José Melgoza Osorio:
Bishop José Melgoza Osorio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Netzahualcóyotl

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015