Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Versailles

Dioecesis Versaliensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 29 November 1801
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Paris
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 2,271 (877 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ile-de-France
  • Official Web Site: https://www.catholique78.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 16 rue Monseigneur Gibier, 78000 Versailles CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 1.30.97.67.96

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
29 November 1801ErectedArchdiocese of Paris Diocese of Versailles (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Chartres (suppressed) Diocese of Versailles
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Versailles Diocese of Chartres
20 January 1933Territory LostDiocese of Versailles (Part of Ruelli) Archdiocese of Paris
9 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Paris
Diocese of Versailles
Diocese of Créteil (erected) (Val-de-Marne)
Diocese of Nanterre (erected) (Hauts-de-Seine)
Diocese of Saint-Denis (erected) (Seine-Saint Denis)
9 October 1966Territory LostDiocese of Versailles (Essonne) Diocese of Corbeil (erected)
9 October 1966Territory LostDiocese of Versailles (Val-d'Oise) Diocese of Pontoise (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
19501,000,0001,500,00066.7%8051219261,0791,0002,500587ap1951
1970600,000853,38670.3%370954651,290951,100256ap1971
19801,039,0001,094,00095.0%315914062,559596900269ap1981
19901,210,0001,212,53999.8%246883343,6221895745268ap1991
1999906,0001,342,00067.5%234612953,0714061637269ap2000
2000850,0001,351,00062.9%218602783,0574660637269ap2001
2001800,0001,351,00059.2%217602772,8884460637269ap2002
2002800,0001,352,14159.2%216602762,8984961420269ap2003
2003800,0001,352,14159.2%212552672,9965056410269ap2004
2004800,0001,352,14159.2%204382423,3055239320288ap2005
2010700,0001,394,26650.2%193362293,0566036275287ap2011
2014935,0001,441,14764.9%202262284,1004826145287ap2015
2017913,4491,405,30665.0%182222044,4774723243286ap2018
2020926,9001,438,26664.4%180292094,434582923666ap2021
2022929,0001,441,39864.5%176282044,553673618965ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 394
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 653

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 1 Apr 2024