Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien (Luc) Jacques Marie Joseph Crepy, C.I.M.

Bishop of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1958 Born
10 Dec 198830.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
21 May 198931.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
12 Feb 201556.7AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
12 Apr 201556.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
6 Feb 202162.7AppointedBishop of Versailles, France
11 Apr 202162.9InstalledBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Lucien (Luc) Jacques Marie Joseph Crepy (VIAF: 2689998)
Bishop Lucien (Luc) Jacques Marie Joseph Crepy C.I.M. (born ) Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Le Puy-en-Velay, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Versailles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 Feb 2015
  • c34: CB, 4 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,475
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2021
  • i: CB, 6 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast