Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas Marie Georges Jude Lalanne

Bishop Emeritus of Pontoise, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1948 Born
8 Nov 197527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
4 Apr 200758.6AppointedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
3 Jun 200758.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
31 Jan 201364.4AppointedBishop of Pontoise, France
6 Apr 201364.6InstalledBishop of Pontoise, France
4 Jun 202475.8RetiredBishop of Pontoise, France

MicroData Summary for Stanislas Marie Georges Jude Lalanne
(VIAF: 228699119; WikiData: Q556336)
Bishop Stanislas Marie Georges Jude Lalanne (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pontoise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMetz, Diocese of Metz
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coutances, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pontoise.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,430
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2013
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 4 Jun 2024