Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

Archidioecesis Salernitana-Campaniensis-Acernensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrea Bellandi, Archbishop
  • Luigi Moretti, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Gerardo Pierro, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,398 (539 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Campania
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisalerno.it/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo Arcivescovile, Via Roberto il Guiscardo 2, 84121 Salerno, Italia
  • Telephone: 089.25.80.756
  • Fax: 089.25.81.241

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Salerno
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Salerno (erected)
Archdiocese of Salerno
10th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Salerno Archdiocese of Salerno
7 August 1394Territory LostArchdiocese of Salerno Diocese of Cava (de’ Tirreni) (erected)
6 March 1531Territory LostArchdiocese of Salerno Diocese of Giffoni (erected)
1532Territory AddedDiocese of Giffoni (suppressed) Archdiocese of Salerno
Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Acerno
Archdiocese of Salerno
Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Campagna
Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
1886147,875.0%5380147OTC
1950276,900276,950100.0%229103332834133544164ap1951
1970367,642367,84299.9%196187383959239730177ap1971
1980399,701402,70199.3%1761703461,1551203538184ap1981
Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno
1990483,000498,00097.0%2041343381,42841160492187ap1991
1999517,000532,00097.2%2081223301,56661125370164ap2000
2000535,000550,00097.3%2131223351,59761125378163ap2004
2004534,000550,00097.1%2111223331,60360131309163ap2005
2010540,000552,00097.8%2241203441,56945139165163ap2011
2014549,300562,20097.7%215883031,81259121262163ap2015
2017547,000548,90099.7%221853061,78760126263163ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Salerno
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 429, and Page 430
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 227
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 340
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast