Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orso Minutolo

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1329AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
27 Jun 1330AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
3 Dec 1333DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orso Minutolo
Archbishop Orso Minutolo (died ) Archbishop of Salerno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 430, and Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Jun 2021

Quantcast