Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Acquaviva

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1369AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
20 Dec 1374AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
24 Nov 1378AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
1382¹DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Acquaviva
Archbishop Giovanni Acquaviva (died 1382) Archbishop of Salerno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 430, and Page 84
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Jun 2021

Quantcast