Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Illiano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1935Born
1960¹24.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
2 Jul 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
8 Aug 198752.0AppointedBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
3 Oct 198752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
24 Oct 198752.2InstalledBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
28 Jul 199055.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
23 Feb 199155.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
24 Mar 201175.6RetiredBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
6 Feb 202084.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Illiano (VIAF: 89623665)
Bishop Gioacchino Illiano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacoli, Diocese of Pozzuoli
Ordained PriestSan Matteo, Cathedral, Salerno, Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
Ordained BishopS. Matthieu, Salerno, Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno
Death PlaceNocera Superiore, Diocese of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno
Buried Place (Original)San Prisco, Cathedral, Nocera Inferiore, Diocese of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,416
  • d: CB, 6 Feb 2020
  • od/c01/loc: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast