Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova

Archidioecesis Rheginensis-Bovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Fortunato Morrone, Archbishop
  • Giuseppe Fiorini Morosini, O.M., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Vittorio Luigi Mondello, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,004 (387 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Calabria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.reggiobova.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Via Tommaso Campanella 63, 89127 Reggio Calabria, Italia
  • Telephone: 0965.38.55.11
  • Fax: 0965.38.55.43

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Reggio Calabria
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Reggio Calabria (erected)
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
11th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Reggio Calabria Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
10 June 1979Territory AddedDiocese of Mileto (S. Maria a Monte Carmelo in Ceramida) Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
29 January 1980Territory AddedDiocese of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi (Covala) Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Bova
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
1886126,637.0%393086OTC
1949211,900212,47699.7%167342011,05452365100ap1951
1969230,471231,21899.7%151592101,09769550103ap1971
1980245,000247,00099.2%146552011,21859547116ap1981
Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova
1990263,000269,05097.8%126541801,461157625135ap1991
1999270,420278,82097.0%118571751,5451866601136ap2000
2000270,420288,50193.7%107571641,6481766601136ap2001
2001270,420288,50193.7%107571641,6482766601136ap2002
2002270,420288,50193.7%118571751,5452773601136ap2003
2003270,420288,50093.7%117571741,5542875598136ap2004
2004277,219279,41899.2%106631691,6402778601121ap2005
2010278,500282,24098.7%118641821,5303770324119ap2011
2014279,260283,72098.4%119531721,6234061324119ap2015
2017281,200285,60098.5%106511571,7914455322119ap2018
2020278,315282,76098.4%112371491,8674945322120ap2021
2022275,000279,00098.6%113361491,8454944322120ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Reggio Calabria
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 916, to Page 917
  • Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 418
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 222
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 332
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 356
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 71, Page 1,360, and Page 1,361
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 95, and Page 96
  • Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 772, to Page 775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 23 Mar 2024