Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Centelles

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1529AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
17 Aug 1529Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
1535¹ResignedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Centelles
Archbishop Girolamo Centelles , Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1529, Number 19
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast