Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)

Dioecesis Locrensis-Hieracensis (-Sanctae Mariae de Pulsi)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francesco Oliva, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,248 (482 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Calabria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesilocri.it/
  • Mailing Address: Episcopio, Via Garibaldi 104, 89044 Locri [Reggio Calabria], Italia
  • Telephone: 0964.20.781
  • Fax: 0964.23.23.21

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Gerace
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Gerace (erected)
Diocese of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
8 April 1920Name ChangedDiocese of Gerace Diocese of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
Diocese of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
22 February 1954Name ChangedDiocese of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi) Diocese of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi) Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
18 November 1989Territory AddedArchdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace (S. Maria Assunta in Cielo in Camini; S. Maria del Buon Consiglio in Campoli; Santa Famiglia in Caulonia; S. Maria Aiuto dei Cristiani in Ursini; Esaltazione della S. Croce in Monasterace; S. Giuseppe Lavoratore in Monasterace Marina; S. Maria Assunta...) Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
18 November 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano (S. Carlo Borromeo in Panettieri)
Archdiocese of Crotone-Santa Severina (San Michele Arcangelo in Cuturella)
Diocese of Lamezia Terme (Spirito Santo in Castagna)
Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi) (S. Maria del Carmine and S Maria delle Grazie, both in Fabrizia)
Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Gerace
1886106,335.0%393071OTC
Diocese of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
1948148,700149,00099.8%10721091,36426373ap1951
Diocese of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
1970260,000.0%9551000511275ap1971
1980121,900128,30095.0%6214761,6031514177ap1981
Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
1990127,100128,15099.2%5416701,8151711460ap1991
1999131,190131,66599.6%5320731,79722313773ap2000
2000130,048131,15099.2%5419731,78122214073ap2001
2001129,874131,02199.1%5519741,75522214373ap2002
2002132,107133,30799.1%5625811,63022814573ap2003
2003132,105133,28199.1%5623791,67212314773ap2004
2004132,511134,04398.9%5225771,72012514773ap2005
2013122,000133,00091.7%6329921,32673111374ap2014
2016113,545123,97591.6%6018781,4558219174ap2017
2019113,000123,40091.6%6123841,3459288974ap2020
2021105,642119,56088.4%4818661,6009216573ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Gerace
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 263
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 159
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 202
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 882, to Page 883
  • Diocese of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 468, and Page 469
  • Diocese of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 446, and Page 447
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 82, Page 841, to Page 843
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 8 Apr 2024