Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunato Morrone

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1958 Born
1 Oct 198325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
20 Mar 202162.5AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
5 Jun 202162.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
12 Jun 202162.7InstalledArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Morrone
Archbishop Fortunato Morrone (born ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola di Capo Rizzuto, Diocese of Crotone (Cotrone)
Ordained PriestCathedral, Crotone, Diocese of Crotone (Cotrone)
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Madre della Chiesa, Church, Crotone, Archdiocese of Crotone-Santa Severina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2021
  • bpd/c1: AM, 20 Mar 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Mar 2021
  • c2: CB, 8 May 2021
  • c34: CB, 16 May 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 248, Number 20,677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast