Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Liénart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lille, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1884Born
21 Dec 190622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cambrai, France
29 Jun 190723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
25 Oct 191329.7IncardinatedPriest of Lille, France
6 Oct 192844.6AppointedBishop of Lille, France
8 Dec 192844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lille, France
30 Jun 193046.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 193046.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
13 Nov 195470.7AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
Nov 1964³80.7ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
14 Mar 196884.1RetiredBishop of Lille, France
15 Feb 197389.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lille, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Achille Liénart (VIAF: 56658616)
Achille Cardinal Liénart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained DeaconSaint-Maurice, Church, Lille, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopSaint-Christophe, Church, Tourcoing
Death PlaceLille, Diocese of Lille
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Lille, Diocese of Lille

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
  • a cardinal for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 84
  • opd/inca: AJ, 26 Jul 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 244, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 401, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 550, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 683, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast