Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Prosper-Adolphe de Bonfils

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1841Born
23 Dec 186524.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189856.9SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
24 Mar 189856.9ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
29 Jun 189857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
11 Jul 189857.2InstalledBishop of Le Mans, France
2 Jun 191271.1DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Prosper-Adolphe de Bonfils (VIAF: 305226039)
Bishop Marie-Prosper-Adolphe de Bonfils (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCherbourg
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 41
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 244, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 268, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 401, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 418, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 550, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 674, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,038, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast