Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Albert-Joseph Lecomte

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1867Born
19 May 189426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
25 Oct 191346.2IncardinatedPriest of Lille, France
10 Mar 192153.6AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
17 May 192153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
19 May 192153.8InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
17 Aug 193467.0DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Albert-Joseph Lecomte (VIAF: 46754660)
Bishop Charles-Albert-Joseph Lecomte (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComines

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 51
  • opd/inca: AJ, 26 Jul 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 244, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 401, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 550, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 683, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast