Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benoît Marie Pascal Rivière

Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Fraternités Monastiques de Jérusalem)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1954 Born
23 May 198328.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 198329.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 200046.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marseille, France
14 Dec 200046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
18 Feb 200146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
8 Apr 200651.5AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
30 Apr 200651.6InstalledBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France

MicroData Summary for Benoît Marie Pascal Rivière (VIAF: 227389379)
Bishop Benoît Marie Pascal Rivière (born ) Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrive-la-Gaillarde, Diocese of Tulle
Ordained DeaconSaint-Victor, Abbey, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained PriestSainte-Marie-Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopSainte Marie Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,913
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast