Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Arthur Chollet

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1862Born
18 Sep 188624.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 191048.0AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
29 Jun 191048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
21 Nov 191351.6AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
2 Dec 195290.6DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Arthur Chollet (VIAF: 22153389)
Archbishop Jean-Arthur Chollet (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvocourt

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 53
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 244, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 401, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 550, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 683, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast