Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bertrand Didier Marie Joseph Lacombe

Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1966 Born
24 Jun 200134.6Ordained PriestPriest of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières), France
14 Apr 201649.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
14 Apr 201649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Saint-Papoul
12 Jun 201649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saint-Papoul
22 Oct 202053.9AppointedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
22 Nov 202054.0InstalledArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Didier Marie Joseph Lacombe (VIAF: 282760418)
Archbishop Bertrand Didier Marie Joseph Lacombe (born ) Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
Ordained BishopSaint-André, Cathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2016
  • ob/c1: CB, 14 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 25 May 2016
  • mn: CB, 27 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,939
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2020
  • i: CB, 22 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 24 Oct 2020

Quantcast