Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Marie-Benjamin Cardinal Richard de la Vergne

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1819Born
21 Dec 184425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
24 Oct 187152.6SelectedBishop of Belley, France
22 Dec 187152.8ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
11 Feb 187252.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
15 Feb 187252.9InstalledBishop of Belley, France
10 May 187556.1SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
5 Jul 187556.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paris, France
5 Jul 187556.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
8 Jul 188667.3SucceededArchbishop of Paris, France
24 May 188970.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 188970.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
28 Jan 190888.9DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Benjamin Richard de la Vergne (VIAF: 39475033)
François-Marie-Benjamin Cardinal Richard de la Vergne (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopDames du Sacré-Coeur, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Current)Sacred Heart Basilica, Montmartre, Crypt, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 144, and Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 18
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 217, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 263, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 345, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 364, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 418, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 491, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 541, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 624, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 671, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 725, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 852, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,038, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast