Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Colonna (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Prefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1724Born
24 Sep 175935.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175935.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
9 Mar 176035.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Feb 176136.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 176237.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
19 Apr 176237.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
25 Apr 176237.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
1763²38.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops
Jan 1763³38.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
25 Jun 178459.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
20 Sep 178460.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
4 Dec 179369.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Colonna (Jr.) (VIAF: 88724830)
Marcantonio Cardinal Colonna (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopPauline du palais apostolique du Quirinal, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
  • a cardinal for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 140
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 285, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast