Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius X

St. Giuseppe Melchiorre Sarto

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1835Born
27 Feb 185822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Treviso, Italy
18 Sep 185823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
10 Nov 188449.4AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
16 Nov 188449.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
12 Jun 189358.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189358.0AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
15 Jun 189358.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
4 Aug 190368.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Aug 190368.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
13 Mar 190468.7ResignedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
20 Aug 191479.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Jun 1951Beatified
29 May 1954Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Giuseppe Melchiorre Sarto (VIAF: 95295599)
Pope St. Giuseppe Melchiorre Sarto (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiese, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestCastelfranco
Ordained BishopSant’Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVatican, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's Basilica, Grotto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Presentation Chapel, San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1893
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 364, and Page 585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47
  • r: CB, 22 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 55
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 134
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 246, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 260, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 343, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 361, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 610, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 737, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 846, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast