Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cástor Oswaldo Azuaje Pérez, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1951Born
31 Aug 197422.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 Dec 197524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
30 Jun 200755.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
30 Jun 200755.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vertara
31 Aug 200755.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vertara
3 Apr 201260.4AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
8 Jan 202169.2DiedBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Cástor Oswaldo Azuaje Pérez
Bishop Cástor Oswaldo Azuaje Pérez O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Ordained BishopSan Tarcisiio, Church, Maracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Death PlacePrivate clinic, Valera

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,494
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2012
  • d: CB, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 9 Jan 2021

Quantcast