Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict XV

Giacomo Giambattista della Chiesa

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1854Born
21 Dec 187824.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 190146.4AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
16 Dec 190753.0AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
22 Dec 190753.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
25 May 191459.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 191459.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
3 Sep 191459.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Sep 191459.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Jan 192267.1DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Giambattista della Chiesa (VIAF: 78769797)
Pope Giacomo Giambattista della Chiesa (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePegli
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 71
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 34
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 246, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 264, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 361, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 406, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 610, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 664, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast