Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Jean Marie Le Boulc’h

Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1960 Born
5 Jul 198726.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
19 Jun 198827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
5 Sep 201353.0AppointedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
27 Oct 201353.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Jean Marie Le Boulc’h
Bishop Laurent Jean Marie Le Boulc’h (born ) Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoudéac, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Ordained DeaconGymnasium, Loudéac, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Ordained PriestSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Coutances, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Sep 2013
  • c2+: CB, 3 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 146
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,979
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast