Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Abagna Mossa

Archbishop of Owando, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1946 Born
29 Dec 197428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Fort-Rousset, Congo
11 Feb 201164.6AppointedBishop of Owando, Congo
26 Mar 201164.7Ordained BishopBishop of Owando, Congo
3 Apr 201164.7InstalledBishop of Owando, Congo
30 May 202073.9AppointedArchbishop of Owando, Congo

MicroData Summary for Victor Abagna Mossa
Archbishop Victor Abagna Mossa (born ) Archbishop of Owando

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMakoua
Ordained BishopStade Félix Eboué, Brazzaville, Archdiocese of Brazzaville

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Owando.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,978
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast