Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hippolyte Louis Jean Simon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1944Born
27 Jun 197026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Coutances (-Avranches), France
22 Feb 199651.9AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
4 May 199652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
8 Dec 200258.7AppointedArchbishop of Clermont, France
17 Mar 201672.0ResignedArchbishop of Clermont, France
25 Aug 202076.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte Louis Jean Simon (VIAF: 46772130)
Archbishop Hippolyte Louis Jean Simon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Georges-de-Rouelley, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Coutances, Diocese of Coutances (-Avranches)
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de l’Assomption, Cathedral, Clermont-Ferrand, Archdiocese of Clermont
Death PlaceRetirement Home, les Petites Soeurs des Pauvres, Caen, Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux)
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame de l’Assomption, Cathedral, Clermont-Ferrand, Archdiocese of Clermont

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,718
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2016
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)
  • c1/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast