Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sabri Anar

Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1966 Born
10 Nov 199024.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 202256.6SelectedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
24 May 202357.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
16 Jul 202357.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Sabri Anar
(WikiData: Q109673791)
Archbishop Sabri Anar (born ) Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUludere
Ordained PriestSacrť Coeur, Church, Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Esprit, Cathedral, Istanbul

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2023
  • c1: CB, 24 May 2023
  • ob: CB, 8 Jun 2023
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jul 2023
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 257, Number 21,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 4 Mar 2024