Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Luis Geromini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Zabi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1906Born
14 Jun 193023.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 195245.7AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
8 Jun 195245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
23 May 195851.8ResignedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
23 May 195851.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
8 Mar 197265.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Carlos Luis Geromini
Bishop Carlos Luis Geromini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa de Copán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegucigalpa

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast