Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildefonso Vargas y Abarca, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1633³BornToledo
23 Sep 165623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
22 Nov 167744.6AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
24 Feb 167945.9Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
9 May 169764.1DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Vargas y Abarca:
Bishop Ildefonso Vargas y Abarca O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2/b: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 219, Number 1,358
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014