Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Rodríguez de Rivas y Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹BornRiobamba
13 Aug 175043.6SelectedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
16 Nov 175043.8ConfirmedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
1751¹44.0Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
29 Mar 176255.2AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
23 Feb 176457.1InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
11 Dec 177063.9DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Rodríguez de Rivas y Velasco:
Bishop Diego Rodríguez de Rivas y Velasco (born 1707, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175, and Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015