Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Pineda Fasquelle, C.M.F.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

Titular Bishop of Obori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1960 Born
25 Apr 198726.3Solemn VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
19 Dec 198727.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Jul 198827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 May 200544.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras
21 May 200544.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Obori
16 Jul 200544.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obori
20 Jul 201857.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tegucigalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Juan José Pineda Fasquelle (VIAF: 89078593)
Bishop Juan José Pineda Fasquelle C.M.F. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tegucigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Suyapa, Basilica, Tegucigalpa, Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,943
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 Jul 2018

Quantcast