Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Navas, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1741BornMérida, Spain
1 Jun 179553.9AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
15 Nov 179554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
1809²67.5DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Navas:
Bishop Vicente Navas O.P. (born ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 114, Number 595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013