Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio López Portillo de Guadalupe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1679Born
19 Nov 172546.5AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
13 Jul 172748.1Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
6 Jan 174262.6DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Antonio López Portillo de Guadalupe
Bishop Antonio López Portillo de Guadalupe O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, México

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,469
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast