Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Macarulla Minguilla de Aguilain

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1718³Born
14 Dec 176749.6AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
1768²49.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
14 Dec 177254.6AppointedBishop of Durango, México
16 Feb 177455.8InstalledBishop of Durango, México
12 Jun 178163.1DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Macarulla Minguilla de Aguilain
Bishop Antonio Macarulla Minguilla de Aguilain (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenabarre, Spain

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 431
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175, and Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast