Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hipólito Casiano Flórez

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1803³BornComayagua
4 Apr 185450.5AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
6 May 185551.6Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
29 Sep 185754.0DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hipólito Casiano Flórez:
Bishop Hipólito Casiano Flórez (born , died ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013