Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carranza Chévez

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1920Born
19 Dec 194222.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 196242.1AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
25 Jul 196242.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras
17 Jul 198060.2DiedBishop of Santa Rosa de Copán, Honduras

MicroData Summary for José Carranza Chévez
Bishop José Carranza Chévez (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Copán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComayagua

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast