Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Cabana

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1894Born
28 Jul 191823.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 194146.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
24 May 194146.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anchialus
30 Jun 194146.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Anchialus
29 Jan 195257.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
28 May 195257.5SucceededArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
7 Feb 196873.2ResignedArchbishop of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
7 Feb 196873.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Succuba
27 Nov 197076.0ResignedTitular Archbishop of Succuba
6 Feb 198691.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges Cabana
Archbishop Georges Cabana (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sherbrooke

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNotre-Dame de Granby

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast