Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NoŽl Delaquis

Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada

Titular Bishop of Gravelbourg

Priest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1934 Born
5 Jun 195823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
3 Dec 197338.9AppointedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
19 Feb 197439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
5 Mar 197439.1InstalledBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
10 Apr 199560.2ResignedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
14 Nov 199863.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gravelbourg
2005²70.0EnteredMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
29 Jun 200873.5ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
2014²79.0IncardinatedPriest of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NoŽl Delaquis
Bishop NoŽl Delaquis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gravelbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNotre-Dame-de-Lourdes, Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba
Ordained BishopSaint-Boniface, Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gravelbourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • prof: CB
  • ocs: CB, 21 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 22 Aug 2018

Quantcast