Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert LeGatt

Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1953 Born
9 Jun 198330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
26 Jul 200148.2AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
5 Oct 200148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
3 Jul 200956.1AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
21 Sep 200956.3InstalledArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albert LeGatt
Archbishop Albert LeGatt (born ) Archbishop of Saint-Boniface

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelfort

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint-Boniface.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,065

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast