Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice Baudoux

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1902BornLa Louvière, Belgium
17 Jul 192927.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 194846.0AppointedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
28 Oct 194846.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
4 Mar 195249.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
4 Mar 195249.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
14 Sep 195553.1SucceededArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
7 Sep 197472.1ResignedArchbishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
1 Jul 198885.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Maurice Baudoux:
Archbishop Maurice Baudoux (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Boniface

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015